IL SB0059 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Student Transfer Achievement Reform Act. Provides that a public community college student who earns an associate degree for transfer granted pursuant to the Act is deemed eligible for transfer into the baccalaureate program of a State university if the student (1) completes 60 semester units or 90 quarter units that are eligible for transfer to a State university and (2) obtains of a minimum grade point average of 2.0 on a 4.0 scale. Requires a community college district to develop and grant associate degrees for transfer that meet the requirements of the Act. Requires a State university to guarantee admission with junior status to any community college student who meets all of the requirements of the Act. Provides that a State university shall grant a local community college student priority admission and admission to a program or major that is similar to his or her community college major or area of emphasis. Provides that a student admitted under the Act shall receive priority over all other community college transfer students. Sets forth provisions concerning coursework, reviews and reports by the Board of Higher Education, and implementation of the Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDENT TRANSFER ACHIEVEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2012-03-06SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
2012-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2012-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2011-07-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
2011-07-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2011-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Higher Education
2011-05-06SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011
2011-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2011-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett
2011-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2011-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2011-04-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011
2011-04-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
2011-04-08SenateSecond Reading
2011-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011
2011-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 011-000-000
2011-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2011-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2011-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2011-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2011-02-09SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2011-01-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-01-27SenateFirst Reading
2011-01-27SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.35New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback