IL SB0059 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the long-time occupant homestead exemption, provides that the exemption applies regardless of whether or not the county has elected to be subject to the provisions of the alternative general homestead exemption. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX-OWNER-OCCUPANT
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-16 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Postponed - Revenue; Subcommittee on Property Taxes | |
2009-02-19 | To Revenue Subcommittee on Property Taxes | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0059.htm |