IL SB0058 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Police and Community Relations Improvement Act. Provides that each law enforcement agency shall adopt a written policy regarding drug testing following an officer-involved shooting. Provides that the written policy adopted by the law enforcement agency must include the following requirements: (1) each law enforcement officer who is involved in an officer-involved shooting must submit to alcohol and drug testing; and (2) the alcohol and drug testing must be completed as soon as possible after the shooting but no later than one hour after the officer-involved shooting. Defines "officer-involved shooting". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE SHOOTING-DRUG TEST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-01-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-05SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
507271-25New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback