IL SB0057 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that any campaign, party, or other organization or individual that engages in a vote by mail operation in which voters are sent applications for vote by mail ballots shall also provide the voter with a return envelope addressed only to the appropriate local election authority for that registered voter. Removes language providing for if an application is sent to a post office box controlled by an individual or organization that is not an election authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-MAIL BALLOT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-07SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-16SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-16SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10519-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback