IL SB0055 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that August 4th of each year is designated as Barack Obama Day.
Title
BARACK OBAMA DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0037 |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |