IL SB0054 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 20 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that money received by the State from the federal government under the Recreational Trails Program shall not be considered for use as aid in construction of highways, and shall not be placed in the "Road Fund" in the State treasury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HWY CD-RECREATION TRAIL FUNDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2016-12-20SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60553-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback