IL SB0053 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "secondary vehicle" as a motor vehicle of the first division or motor vehicle of the second division weighing 8,000 pounds or less that is used less than 5,000 miles per registration year. Provides that an owner of a secondary vehicle may register the vehicle as a secondary vehicle and shall complete at the time of registration and at any subsequent annual registrations an odometer certification verifying the vehicle's mileage use. Provides that a vehicle registered as a secondary vehicle is not required to display a front license plate on the secondary vehicle. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SECOND VEH-FRONT PLATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2016-12-05SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-182.7New CodeSee Bill Text
62553-413Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-804.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback