IL SB0052 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act, the Public Utilities Act, and the Energy Assistance Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, the Illinois Commerce Commission, and the Illinois Power Agency shall cooperate in issuing a report evaluating opportunities for electric utility customers' ability to participate in the State's clean energy economy. Provides for repeal of the provisions on January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
ENERGY ECONOMY ACCESS STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 20 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=52&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0052.htm |