IL SB0052 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Horsemen's Council of Illinois Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of decals for Universal special license plates by the Horsemen's Council of Illinois. Provides for the original fee, renewal fees, and fee distribution for Universal special license plates with decals issued by the Horsemen's Council of Illinois.
Title
VEH CD-HORSEMEN COUNCIL PLATE
Sponsors
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0078 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-001 |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |