IL SB0051 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the maximum length of a truck tractor in combination with a semitrailer may not exceed 65 feet (rather than 55 feet) overall dimension on all non-State highways. Removes the requirement that truck tractor-semitrailer combinations must have no more than a maximum 55 feet overall wheel base on Class III roadways and other non-designated State highways. Provides that the distance between the kingpin and the axle of a semitrailer longer than 48 feet, in combination with a truck tractor, may not exceed 42 feet 6 inches, unless the trailer or semitrailer is used for the transport of livestock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-LENGTH AND SIZE REQ

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-05HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-04-05HouseArrived in House
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 016-000-000
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2016-12-05SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-107Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback