IL SB0050 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that no product that combines beer or any other alcoholic liquor with caffeine, guarana, taurine, or other similar substances that are commonly referred to as "alcohol energy drinks" may be imported into the State or produced, manufactured, distributed, sold, or offered for sale in this State by a licensee under the Act.
Title
ALCOHOL ENERGY DRINK BAN
Sponsors
Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Arthur Wilhelmi [D] |
Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Derrick Smith [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 76 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0634 |
2011-12-16 | Senate | Effective Date December 16, 2011 |
2011-12-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 042-011-000 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 042-011-000 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Held in Executive |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Held in Executive |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-08 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 8, 2011 |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2011-10-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-035-003 |
2011-10-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2011-10-27 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-10-26 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-10-26 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-10-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2011-10-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-10-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-10-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-10-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-10-21 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-10-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-10-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-10-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-10-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-10-06 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-10-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2011 |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2011-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2011 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2011 |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-36 | New Code | See Bill Text |