IL SB0050 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $14,500,000 from the Local Government Road Salt Purchase Reimbursement Fund to the Department of Transportation for the purpose of providing grants to counties, municipalities, townships, and road districts for road salt reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
$IDOT-ROAD SALT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-03-25 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-001 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-06 | Held in Executive | |
2009-03-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Executive | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-27 | Postponed - Executive | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy | |
2009-02-19 | Held in Executive | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-02-03 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2009-02-03 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. J. Bradley Burzynski | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |