IL SB0049 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Removes the requirement that educator licensure candidates pass a teacher performance assessment. Makes related changes. Effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TEACHER LICENSURE TEST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-20SenatePostponed - Education
2021-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-04-13SenateAssigned to Education
2021-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-02-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-02-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-02-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading
2021-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Darren Bailey

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-30Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-50Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback