IL SB0048 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning vendor enrollment in the medical assistance program, provides that nothing in the provision shall be construed to require a vendor or provider who exclusively offers telehealth services or any telehealth provider group to maintain a physical address or office in Illinois or have an Illinois mailing address in order to be eligible to enroll as a vendor or provider in the medical assistance program, if the vendor, provider, or telehealth provider group is licensed or authorized to practice in Illinois and has a principal place of business located in the United States.
Title
MEDICAID-TELEHEALTH SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=48&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0048.htm |