IL SB0048 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0223
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Torture Inquiry and Relief Commission Act. Creates the Illinois Torture Inquiry and Relief Commission as an independent commission under the Illinois Human Rights Commission for administrative purposes. Provides that the Commission shall conduct inquiries into claims of torture with priority to be given to those cases in which the convicted person is currently incarcerated solely for the crime with respect to which he or she claims torture by Jon Burge or officers under his command, or both. Provides that if the Commission concludes there is sufficient evidence of torture to merit judicial review, the Chair of the Commission shall request the Chief Judge of the Circuit Court of Cook County for assignment to a trial judge for consideration. Provides that the Act applies to claims of torture filed not later than 5 years after the effective date of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
TORTURE COMMISSION
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. James Meeks [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0223 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date August 10, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-05-13 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2009-05-13 | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2009-05-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-04-20 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-002-002 | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James T. Meeks | |
2009-03-25 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 006-001-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Constitutional Review | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-26 | Postponed - Criminal Law; Subcommittee on Constitutional Review | |
2009-02-19 | Postponed - Criminal Law; Subcommittee on Constitutional Review | |
2009-02-11 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Constitutional Review | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |