IL SB0046 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Conveyances Act. Provides that special warranty deeds may be made in a specified form. Provides that every deed in substance in the specified form shall be deemed and held a conveyance in fee simple, to the grantee, his or her heirs and assigns, with specified covenants on the part of the grantor.
Title
SPECIAL WARRANTY DEEDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-03-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 5 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |