IL SB0044 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grant Information Collection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-02SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2017
2017-02-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
307071Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback