IL SB0042 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Nursing Home Medicaid Reimbursement Reform Act. Provides that it shall be a matter of State policy that all residents of facilities licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act who meet the financial requirements for medical assistance and have a determination of need score of 29 or greater shall be guaranteed the right to: (1) select the facility in which he or she receives care; (2) participate fully in the development of his or her individualized care plan; and (3) be informed in advance of any changes to his or her individualized care plan or to the status of his or her nursing home stay. Provides that all medical treatment and services deemed medically necessary by a physician licensed to practice medicine in all of its branches, including the provision of prescription drugs not covered under a qualified Medicare Part D Prescription Drug Plan, shall be presumed to be available for any resident who is eligible for medical assistance and shall qualify for reimbursement under the Medical Assistance Program. Provides that any medical services provided, as specified in the Act, to a resident of a facility licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act shall be reimbursed based on an aggregate rate composed of nursing, support, and capital components. Provides that the State shall also reimburse each facility paying property taxes an amount that equals the facility's actual property tax bill, if applicable. Provides that any additional funds contained in the State Fiscal Year 2020 budget in excess of those expended in the State Fiscal Year 2019 budget shall be distributed by statute. Provides that reimbursement payments for services covered under the Act are due and payable on the last day of each month for all claims submitted during the preceding calendar month. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING HOME MEDICAID REIMBURS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |