IL SB0039 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that communications and materials exchanged between an attorney-lobbyist and a public body that concern either lobbying to be performed on behalf of the public body by the attorney-lobbyist or the expenditure of public moneys for goods or services to be provided on behalf of the public body by the attorney-lobbyist are public records, are not exempt from inspection and copying unless otherwise exempt under a specific provision of the Act, and are not privileged from disclosure at trial unless otherwise required by law.
Title
FOIA-ATTY-LOBBYIST/PUBLIC BODY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-03 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; /3-14-2011 - Postponed |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; /3-14-2011 - Postponed |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; /3-14-2011 - Postponed |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Held in Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Johnson |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |