IL SB0037 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that the fire chief of a secondary employer shall report any injury, illness, or exposure incurred by a secondary employee during his or her employment to the primary employer's pension fund within 96 hours from the time of the occurrence. Provides that a municipality (instead of a unit of local government) that has established a pension fund under the Downstate Firefighter Article and who employs a full-time firefighter shall be deemed a primary employer with respect to that full-time firefighter. Provides that any municipality (instead of any unit of local government) of 5,000 or more inhabitants that employs or enrolls a firefighter (instead of employs a firefighter) and meets other criteria shall be deemed a secondary employer. Requires a secondary employer to annually prepare a report a report accounting for all hours worked by and wages and salaries (instead of wages and salaries) paid to secondary employee firefighters. Requires a certified copy of the report to be transmitted to the primary employer's pension fund (instead of the primary employer). Removes provisions requiring a secondary employer to make specified contributions to the primary employer's firefighters' pension fund. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-DNST FIRE-SECONDARY EMPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0522
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Government Accountability and Ethics; 007-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Government Accountability and Ethics
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-001
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-05-03HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Steven Reick
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-010-000
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2019
2019-03-27SenateDo Pass as Amended Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-001-000
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Government Accountability and Ethics
2019-03-21SenateAssignments Re-refers to Government Accountability and Ethics
2019-03-20SenateTo
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Ethics
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Ethics
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-118Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=37&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0037.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0037eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0037enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0522.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0037sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0037sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0037ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0037ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0037_04112019_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0037_05292019_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0037ham002_05312019_057000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback