IL SB0035 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that, for purposes of treatment in the early stages of a mental health condition, a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan shall provide coverage for the treatment of serious mental illnesses and serious emotional disturbances. Provides that coverage shall include, but not be limited to, certain evidence-based and evidence-informed bundled treatment approaches. Provides that payment for the services performed under the treatment models shall be based on all the components of the treatment model combined, rather than for each separate service. Provides that disability or functional impairment shall not be a precondition to receive treatment under the provisions. Provides that if federal regulations require the State to defray the cost of coverage for serious mental illnesses or serious emotional disturbances, then the provisions are inoperative and the State shall not assume any obligation for the cost of the coverage. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Fair Insurance Coverage for Early Treatment of Serious Mental Health Conditions Act. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-SERIOUS MENTAL ILLNESS
Sponsors
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] |
Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=35&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0035.htm |