IL SB0035 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMMIGRATION SAFE ZONES ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-004-000
2018-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2017
2017-02-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback