IL SB0035 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMMIGRATION SAFE ZONES ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 60 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 035-016-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-004-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-053-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2018-05-30HouseMotion Prevailed 060-054-000
2018-05-30HouseNote / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-23HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-18HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-18HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-18HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 031-016-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-004-000
2018-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2017
2017-02-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=35&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0035.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0035eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0035enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0035gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0035sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0035sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0035ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0035_05022018_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0035_05302018_059000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0035_05302018_060000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0035ham001_05312018_009000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback