IL SB0034 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VICTIMS OF CRIMINAL ACTIVITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-009-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-003-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2017
2017-02-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51001-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback