IL SB0032 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS TRUST ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-10-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-10-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-10-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-10-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-10-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-30HouseArrived in House
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-006-000
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-05-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 8, 2017
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51401.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback