IL SB0031 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Records Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LAW ENFORCEMENT-IMMIGRATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 031-021-001
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-004-000
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-005
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Steans - added as co-sponsor to Senate Amendment No. 1
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 8, 2017
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2017-01-18SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback