IL SB0030 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Workplace Transparency Act. Provides that employers shall not require an employee or prospective employee to sign a nondisclosure agreement that contains any provision that has the purpose or effect of: limiting the disclosure of sexual misconduct, retaliation, or unlawful discrimination; suppressing information relevant to an investigation into a claim of sexual misconduct, retaliation, or unlawful discrimination; impairing the ability of any person to report a claim of sexual misconduct, retaliation, or unlawful discrimination; or waiving a substantive or procedural right or remedy of any person relating to a claim of sexual misconduct, retaliation, or unlawful discrimination. Provides that any such provision is void as against public policy and unenforceable, and that agreements that contain such provisions and were entered into before the effective date of the Act are voidable by a party who entered into the agreement under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKPLACE TRANSPARENCY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-02-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback