IL SB0029 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Energy Transition Zone Act. Provides for the certification by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity of municipal ordinances designating an area as an Energy Transition Zone. Provides that green energy enterprises located in Energy Transition Zones shall be eligible to apply for certain tax incentives. Provides that a green energy enterprise is a company that is engaged in the production of solar energy, wind energy, water energy, geothermal energy, bioenergy, or hydrogen fuel and cells. Contains provisions concerning qualifications and applications. Creates the Energy Transition Tax Credit Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall make income tax credit awards under the Act to foster job creation and the development of green energy in Energy Transition Zones. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Public Utilities Act to make conforming changes concerning tax incentives. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-GREEN ENERGY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bush
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue
2019-03-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2019-03-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-07SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-01-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22059-221Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-222Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-222.1BNew CodeSee Bill Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
351205k-1New CodeSee Bill Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback