IL SB0026 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits aggravated criminal sexual assault if that person commits an act of sexual penetration with a victim who is at least 18 years of age but under 20 years of age if the act was committed against a victim who is a student attending classes at a public or private secondary school and the accused held a position of trust, authority, or supervision over the victim at the same school. Provides that this offense is a Class X felony. Provides that a person commits criminal sexual abuse if that person commits an act of sexual conduct with a victim who is at least 18 years of age but under 20 years of age if the act was committed against a victim who is a student attending classes at a public or private secondary school and the accused held a position of trust, authority, or supervision in relation to the victim at the same school. Provides that this offense is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEX OFFENSES-STUDENT 18-19

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-20SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-1.30Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-1.50Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-14Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback