IL SB0025 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Agriculture for its FY11 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
$DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Appropriations II |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=25&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/PDF/09700SB0025.pdf |