IL SB0023 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency may not enter into new contracts or renew any contract previously made with one or more responsible parties to construct and operate official inspection stations, provide and maintain approved test equipment, administer tests, certify results, issue emission inspection stickers or certificates, maintain records, train personnel, provide information to the public concerning the program, or otherwise. Provides that any facility that performs maintenance or repair work on motor vehicles as a routine part of its business may apply to the Agency for certification as an official inspection station. Provides that the Agency shall authorize as an official inspection station any applicant that meets specific criteria.
Title
VEH CD-INSPECTION STATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 13C-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 13C-45.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=23&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0023.htm |