IL SB0019 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Failed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Failed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CD CORR-NUMBER DEPT EMPLOYEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-042-000 |
2017-04-06 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion Prevailed 064-046-000 |
2017-04-06 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-06 | House | Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion Prevailed 064-046-000 |
2017-04-06 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-06 | House | Correctional Note Request is Inapplicable |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion Prevailed 064-046-000 |
2017-04-06 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-06 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2017-04-05 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-005-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-05 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-05 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-30 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 011-005-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 415 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |