IL SB0017 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Labor Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1505 | 1505-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |