IL SB0011 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly, State Universities, Downstate Teacher, and Chicago Teacher Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires active Tier 1 employees to elect either to (i) have automatic annual increases in retirement annuity delayed and reduced or (ii) maintain the current benefit package with additional limitations on pensionable salary. Provides that a Tier 1 employee who elects item (i) is entitled to have future increases in income treated as pensionable income, have contributions reduced to a specified rate, and receive a consideration payment of 10% of contributions made prior to the election. Provides that a Tier 1 employee who elects item (ii) is not eligible to have future increases in income treated as pensionable income. Makes funding changes. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System to persons who became participants before the effective date. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act to provide a continuing appropriation for the amounts of the consideration payments. In the Chicago Teacher Article, requires the Fund to make consideration payments. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act and the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act to prohibit bargaining and interest arbitration regarding changes made by the amendatory Act; exempts certain existing agreements. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Makes other changes. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-TIER 1 ELECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-02-08SenateThird Reading - Lost; 018-029-010
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-02-08SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-8Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.53New CodeSee Bill Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
11052085New CodeSee Bill Text
1106605-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11066510-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067015-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11067520-200New CodeSee Bill Text
11068025-195New CodeSee Bill Text
11068530-205New CodeSee Bill Text
11069035-200New CodeSee Bill Text
1107036dAmended CodeCitation Text
1108053-26Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-42Amended CodeCitation Text
115510.6New CodeSee Bill Text
115514Amended CodeCitation Text
115517Amended CodeCitation Text
11554Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-647New CodeSee Bill Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
40151.9New CodeSee Bill Text
40515-108.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-111Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-112.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40515-132.9New CodeSee Bill Text
40515-136Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-155Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-157Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-165Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-198Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-200Repealed CodeCitation Text
40515-200.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40515-201Repealed CodeCitation Text
40515-201.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-107.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-121Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-121.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-122.9New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-133.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-136.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-152Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-203Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-205Repealed CodeCitation Text
40516-205.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-206Repealed CodeCitation Text
40516-206.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40517-106.05New CodeSee Bill Text
40517-113.4New CodeSee Bill Text
40517-113.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40517-115.5New CodeSee Bill Text
40517-116Amended CodeCitation Text
40517-119.2New CodeSee Bill Text
40517-129Amended CodeCitation Text
40517-130Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-131Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-140Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-105.3New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-107Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-107.9New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-108Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-110.3New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-119.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-124Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-126Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-134Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-162Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-165Repealed CodeCitation Text
4052-165.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-166Repealed CodeCitation Text
4052-166.1New CodeSee Bill Text
531510Amended CodeCitation Text
531515Amended CodeCitation Text
53157.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback