IL SB0009 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Coal Ash Cleanup and Storage Act. Provides a short title only.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COAL ASH POLLUTION PREVENTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-011-000
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-05-15HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-15HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-09HouseArrived in House
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-009-007
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Bennett
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bennett
2019-05-09SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-001-000
2019-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-001-000
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
2019-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 005-002-000
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-14SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback