IL SB0007 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Cannabis Regulation and Taxation Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-05-15SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-05-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019
2019-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateDo Pass Executive; 012-004-000
2019-03-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 12, 2019
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-20SenatePostponed - Executive
2019-03-14SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback