IL SB0007 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Repeals provisions of the Code concerning concussions and head injuries and student athletes. Sets forth provisions concerning the prevention, treatment, and oversight of concussions affecting student athletes instead. Requires the governing body of each school district and charter school with students enrolled who participate in an interscholastic athletic activity to appoint or approve a concussion oversight team. Requires each concussion oversight team to establish a return-to-play protocol for a student's return to interscholastic athletics practice or competition following a force or impact believed to have caused a concussion. Sets forth provisions concerning the members of the concussion oversight team; the provision of concussion information to a student and the student's parent or guardian or another person with legal authority to make medical decisions for the student; the removal of a student from an interscholastic athletics practice or competition if he or she might have sustained a concussion; training courses for coaches, athletic trainers, and certain other health care professionals; the development of a venue-specific emergency action plan; immunity; and rulemaking. Makes technical changes having a revisory function. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ATHLETES-CONCUSSIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0245
2015-08-03SenateEffective Date August 3, 2015
2015-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2015-06-23SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2015-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2015-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2015-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2015-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-001
2015-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2015-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2015-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2015-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2015-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
2015-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 021-000-000
2015-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2015-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2015-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2015-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2015-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2015-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2015-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino
2015-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2015-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2015-05-11HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2015-05-11HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
2015-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2015-05-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2015-05-06HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2015-04-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-04-30HouseFirst Reading
2015-04-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2015-04-30HouseArrived in House
2015-04-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2015-04-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
2015-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2015-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2015-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2015-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Raoul
2015-04-30SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2015-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2015-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-04-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2015-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2015
2015-04-29SenateSecond Reading
2015-04-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2015-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2015-04-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 014-000-000
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2015-04-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Education
2015-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2015-04-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
2015-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2015-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2015-04-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
2015-04-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2015-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2015-04-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-03-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
2015-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2015-03-24SenatePostponed - Education
2015-03-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2015-03-18SenatePostponed - Education
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-03-11SenatePostponed - Education
2015-03-03SenateAssigned to Education
2015-02-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2015-02-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski
2015-02-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-15SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-15SenatePrefiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.54Repealed CodeCitation Text
105522-80New CodeSee Bill Text
105527A-5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.46Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=7&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/99/099-0245.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0007sam005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900SB0007_04302015_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900SB0007_05252015_002000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback