IL SB0007 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT ETHICS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-13 | Re-assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-01-11 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-15 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=7&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0007.htm |