IL SB0005 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the State to contribute to the Fund $215,200,000 for fiscal year 2017 and $221,300,000 for fiscal year 2018; includes provisions for certifications and monthly payments by voucher. Provides that beginning in fiscal year 2019, the State shall contribute an amount equal to the employer normal cost for that fiscal year. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act. Provides for a continuing appropriation to the Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago, on a continuing monthly basis, of the amount, if any, by which the total available amount of all other State appropriations to that Retirement Fund for the payment of certain State contributions is less than the total amount of the vouchers for required State contributions lawfully submitted by the Fund for that month under applicable provisions of the Illinois Pension Code. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 3, 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CTPF-STATE CONTRIBUTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateMotion Prevailed
2017-02-28SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-022-001
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40151.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40517-127Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback