IL SB0003 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Hearing: May 30 @ 9:00 am in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code. Provides that the Division applies to all counties (currently, only applies to DuPage, Lake, and McHenry Counties). Excludes specified boards from the definition of "unit of local government". Provides how the status and rights of employees, including those represented by an exclusive bargaining representatives, are affected by the dissolution of a unit of local government under the Division. Provides for the assumption of obligations of the dissolving unit of local government by the entity absorbing the dissolving unit as they relate to representation rights and collective bargaining agreements. Amends the Township Code. Removes a restriction limiting townships to 126 square miles. Provides for the consolidation of 2 or more townships which share a boundary, the merging of one township into 2 other townships, and the dissolution of all townships (currently, only allowed in specified townships) within a coterminous, or substantially coterminous, municipality. Makes other changes. Amends the Election Code. Specifies procedures for township consolidation, merger, and discontinuance referenda. Amends the Illinois Drainage Code. Provides that specified counties may, by resolution, dissolve drainage districts wholly within their borders and drainage districts only partially within its borders under specified circumstances. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that specified township road districts may be abolished by public referendum. Effective on January 1, 2018, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT CONSOLIDATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-18HouseArrived in House
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-006-013
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2017-05-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateMotion Prevailed
2017-02-28SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-014-002
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-02-28SenateMotion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-08SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-02-08SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-014-007
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 9, 2017
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2017-02-08SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 25, 2017
2017-01-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-01-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-01-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10528-1Amended CodeCitation Text
1053-7New CodeSee Bill Text
5552-4006Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-44010Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-44020Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-44043New CodeSee Bill Text
555Div. 2-4 headingAmended CodeCitation Text
60110-25Amended CodeCitation Text
60122-10New CodeSee Bill Text
60122-15New CodeSee Bill Text
60122-20New CodeSee Bill Text
60122-5New CodeSee Bill Text
60123-10New CodeSee Bill Text
60123-15New CodeSee Bill Text
60123-20New CodeSee Bill Text
60123-25New CodeSee Bill Text
60123-5New CodeSee Bill Text
60125-15Amended CodeCitation Text
60125-25Amended CodeCitation Text
60129-10New CodeSee Bill Text
60129-15New CodeSee Bill Text
60129-20New CodeSee Bill Text
60129-25New CodeSee Bill Text
60129-5New CodeSee Bill Text
60165-20Amended CodeCitation Text
601Art. 22 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
601Art. 23 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
601Art. 29 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
60556-130Amended CodeCitation Text
60556-130.5New CodeSee Bill Text
7060510-12New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0003.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0003eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0003sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0003sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0003sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0003sam004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0003_02082017_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0003_02282017_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0003_05172017_002000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback