IL SB0002 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Increases the minimum wage from $8.25 to $9.00 beginning July 1, 2017 and increases it by $0.50 each July 1 until July 1, 2021, at which point the minimum wage will be $11.00. Preempts home rule powers, except that the limitation on home rule powers does not apply to specified ordinances adopted by the City Council of City of Chicago or the Cook County Board of Commissioners. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit against the withholding tax liability of employers with fewer than 50 employees, calculated based on the increase in the minimum wage. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 1, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MINIMUM WAGE-WITHHOLDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-03SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-01-24SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-01-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-01-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-01-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-01-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-01-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-01-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355704AAmended CodeCitation Text
8201054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback