IL SB0001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MINIMUM WAGE/INCOME TAX CREDIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0001
2019-02-19SenateEffective Date February 19, 2019
2019-02-19SenateGovernor Approved
2019-02-15SenateSent to the Governor
2019-02-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-02-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-14SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-047-001
2019-02-14HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2019-02-14HouseJudicial Note Filed
2019-02-14HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2019-02-14HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2019-02-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-02-14HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2019-02-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-02-14HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-02-14HousePension Note Filed
2019-02-14HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-14HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-14HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-02-14HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-02-14HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-02-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-010-000
2019-02-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-02-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-02-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-02-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-02-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-02-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-02-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-02-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-07HouseArrived in House
2019-02-07SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-018-000
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-02-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
2019-02-07SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-02-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-006-000
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-02-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-02-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-01-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 30, 2019
2019-01-29SenateSecond Reading
2019-01-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 29, 2019
2019-01-23SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback