IL SB0001 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0001
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Minimum Wage Law. Provides for an increase in the minimum wage and for a credit against withholding payments in relation to the increase. Increases the minimum wage to $9.25 per hour beginning January 1, 2020. Provides for annual increases in the minimum wage culminating in a minimum wage of $15 per hour beginning on January 1, 2025. Provides to employers with 50 or fewer full-time equivalent employees a credit against tax withheld beginning January 1, 2020. Reduces the credit beginning January 1, 2021. Provides employers may claim the credit amount in effect on January 1, 2025 until December 31, 2026 and that employers with no more than 5 employees may claim that credit until December 31, 2027. Authorizes the Department of Labor to perform random audits of employer to ascertain compliance with the Minimum Wage Law. Authorizes a penalty of $100 per employee for failure to maintain required records. Effective immediately.
Title
MINIMUM WAGE/INCOME TAX CREDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0001 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Effective Date February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-02-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-047-001 |
2019-02-14 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-14 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-14 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-02-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-010-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-018-000 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-006-000 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 30, 2019 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 29, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |