IL SB0001 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction. Effective immediately, but this Act does not take effect at all unless Senate Bills 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 of the 100th General Assembly become law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EVIDENCE-BASED SCHOOL FUNDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-19HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-05-18HouseArrived in House
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-018-003
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Manar
2017-05-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-17SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 8, 2017
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading
2017-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 24, 2017
2017-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-01-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-11SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback