IL HR1504 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulates Joseph Ferreti-Raucci upon his election as President of the Second Grade at the Troy Shorewood Elementary School in Shorewood, Will County

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONGRATS - J. FERRETI-RAUCCI

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-30HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2016-11-29HouseMotion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2016-11-29HousePlaced on Calendar Agreed Resolutions
2016-11-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback