IL HR1503 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes the consideration or passage of any income tax increase on the people of Illinois during any "lame duck" special session that may be called to meet on or after January 1, 2017 at any time prior to January 11, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LAME DUCK - NO INCOME TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-29HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2016-11-29HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-11-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2016-11-28HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2016-11-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-11-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback