IL HR1497 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the death of former State Representative John S. Matijevich.
Title
MEMORIAL - REP. J. MATIJEVICH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2016-11-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-11-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1497&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1497.htm |