IL HR1305 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to grant an extension to Covenant Bank in Chicago, Illinois, for the correction to the impairment of its capital until February 1, 2013 and to continue the extension unless the bank becomes critically undercapitalized. Urges the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to grant the maximum initial term of 180 days to take corrective action to any community bank that has received a Section 51 order, unless that bank is critically undercapitalized.
Title
COVENANT BANK-DEADLINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1305&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1305.htm |