IL HR1300 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a management audit of the relationship between the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum and the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Foundation.
Title
AUDIT-LINCOLN PRES. FOUNDATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-28 | House | Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-11-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1300&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1300.htm |