IL HR1285 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the historic and cultural significance of Quinn Chapel AME.
Title
RECOGNIZE-QUINN CHAPEL AME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Helene Miller Walsh |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-11-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-11-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-11-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1285&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1285.htm |